MAHESH SHARMA
-
About MAHESH SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51909WB2010PTC152650 SHIVRATRI SALES PRIVATE LIMITED 819000.0 Active 05/10/2012 - U51909WB2010PTC153832 SUBHDATA DISTRIBUTOR PRIVATE LIMITED 152040.0 Active 08/10/2012 - U51909WB2013PTC191437 WINWELL TRADECOM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/10/2015 - U70101WB1996PTC081791 GOVIND REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 373000.0 Active 26/09/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
AMRIT LAL SHARMA Director