MITESH DILIP SEJPAL
-
About MITESH DILIP SEJPAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L24100MH1973PLC016908 JD ORGOCHEM LIMITED 13250000.0 Active 29/05/2014 - U70100MH2013PTC242780 TERRAPOLIS COMMERCIAL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/05/2013 - U70101MH2013PTC242754 TERRAPOLIS PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 400000.0 Active 21/10/2013 - U70200MH2013PTC239813 CENTRUM LANDMARK PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/03/2014 - U70200MH2014PTC257862 OPTAMAC REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/02/2016 - -
Associated with Directors