MURARI LAL LAKKAR
-
About MURARI LAL LAKKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51109WB2007PTC112754 VISHWAROOP AGENCIES PRIVATE LIMITED 5866000.0 Active 10/07/2013 - U51909WB2004PTC100273 CHETNA VYAPAAR PRIVATE LIMITED 2521100.0 Active 25/06/2013 - U51909WB2010PTC143083 APOLLO VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 1367060.0 Active 24/06/2013 - U51909WB2011PTC158968 MANGALNIDHI MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 14214451.0 Active 05/08/2017 - U51909WB2011PTC158978 GALLANT DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 155490.0 Active 01/08/2013 - U51909WB2011PTC159042 LINKPLAN MERCHANDISE PRIVATE LIMITED 155140.0 Active 01/08/2013 - U85100WB2013NPL199040 LAKKAR EDUCATION FOUNDATION 9860000.0 Active 13/12/2013 - U85100WB2013NPL199239 SHREE HANUMAN SHIKSHA SADAN 100000.0 Active 24/02/2015 -