MUKTA PANDURANG VERNEKAR
-
About MUKTA PANDURANG VERNEKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U13209GA2010PTC006440 FOMENTO RESOURCES PRIVATE LIMITED 240060.0 Active 23/01/2017 - U27106DL2005PLC142596 SLR METALIKS LIMITED 129457500.0 Active 05/01/2015 - U63090GA1970PTC000103 MAINA ORE TRANSPORT PRIVATE LIMITED 250000.0 Active 28/09/2016 - U74999GA2016PTC007835 FRIENDLY HOSPITALITY SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/12/2016 - -
Associated with Directors