MAHESH KUMAR SHARMA
-
About MAHESH KUMAR SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L51103CT1982PLC009717 MONNET INDUSTRIES LIMITED 186812620.0 Active 07/05/2016 - U02919TZ1995PLC006291 HI-TECH ELECTROTHERMICS AND HYDRO POWER LIMITED 204014000.0 Active 30/08/2017 - U10100MP2009SGC022639 MP MONNET MINING COMPANY LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 21/03/2017 - U10102DL2002PTC116287 AP COAL WASHERIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/08/2016 - U27101WB2004PTC195282 TIRUMALA BALAJI ALLOYS PRIVATE LIMITED 155000000.0 Active 28/03/2017 - U45201DL1980PTC010882 CAMBRIDGE CONSTRUCTION ( DELHI ) LIMITED 10594340.0 Active 28/08/2017 - U45400DL2009PTC195732 TORRENS TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/08/2017 - U67120WB1993PLC058084 EXCELLO FIN LEA LTD 14761530.0 Active 01/09/2017 - U74899DL1978PTC009075 PACE ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 7000000.0 Active 28/08/2017 - U74900DL2011PTC216741 MONNET ECOMAISTER ENVIRO PRIVATE LIMITED 284227260.0 Active 27/01/2017 - -
Associated with Directors