NEELAM ARYA
-
About NEELAM ARYA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27109DL1982PLC084678 JBM INDUSTRIES LIMITED 19264970.0 Active 20/12/1994 - U27109HR1975PLC007910 JAICO STEEL FASTNERS LIMITED 7500000.0 Amalgamated 17/08/2000 - U40300DL2013PTC249282 JBM RENEWABLES PRIVATE LIMITED 250000000.0 Active 20/01/2016 - U45200DL1993PTC054079 SAMMAN PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 27850200.0 Active 18/08/1998 - U45200DL2007PTC160649 MULTIVISION CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 49500000.0 Active 30/06/2008 - U45200DL2007PTC162075 GREEN LAND TECHNOBUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 71100000.0 Active 02/12/2015 - U74899DL1990PLC101070 GURERA INDUSTRIES LIMITED 46607000.0 Active 02/04/2001 - U74899DL1991PTC044376 JBM BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 17254000.0 Active 01/04/1995 - U74899DL1995PLC064073 JAY BHARAT EXHAUST SYSTEMS LIMITED 3374000.0 Amalgamated 05/01/1995 - U74899DL1995PLC067432 JBM INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 4527000.0 Active 28/04/2016 - U74899DL1998PTC095612 ANS HOLDING PRIVATE LIMITED 100200.0 Active 18/08/1998 -