NILESH RAVINDRA PURANIK
-
About NILESH RAVINDRA PURANIK,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45201MH2011PTC215773 SYNS BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/04/2011 - U45202MH2011PTC216339 NRP REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/04/2011 - U45400MH2007PTC170399 PURANIK BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 6403080.0 Active 02/05/2013 - U45400MH2011PTC216374 S.G.P REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/04/2011 - U45400MH2011PTC216387 SHP REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/04/2011 - U45400MH2011PTC216390 Y.G.P REALITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/04/2011 - U45400MH2012PTC232897 FORTUNE INFRACREATORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/09/2015 - U55200MH1998PTC117512 PURANIK CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/12/1998 - U99999MH1990PTC056451 PURANIK BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 666482070.0 Active 08/05/1990 -