NALIN SOMCHAND PARIKH
-
About NALIN SOMCHAND PARIKH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U13200MH1997PTC108796 METMIN EXPLORATION PRIVATE LIMITED 66119000.0 Active 17/06/1997 - U27310MH2007PTC174545 METTUBE INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 27/09/2007 - U27310MH2011PTC223052 SAVLI COPPER PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED 62719200.0 Active 15/10/2011 - U45202MH1970PTC014701 WRM PRIVATE LIMITED 1000200.0 Active 08/07/1970 - U51209MH1975PTC018421 K PARIKH AGENCIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/08/1975 - U65910MH1998PTC207448 ANJANA FINCAP PRIVATE LIMITED 400000.0 Active 08/08/2006 - U65923MH1990PTC054964 METMIN FINANCE AND HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 25218100.0 Active 18/01/1993 - U67120MH1986PTC038916 FLEURETTE INVESTMENTS PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 12/02/1986 - U67120MH1993PTC071474 METMIN INVESTMENT AND TRADING PVT LTD 209923200.0 Active 14/03/1994 - U85100MH2013NPL242306 BAGRI FOUNDATION INDIA 200000.0 Active 28/05/2013 - U85100MH2014NPL259100 AKSHAT CHARITABLE FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 05/11/2014 - U85320MH2014NPL257987 AKTIS FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 10/09/2014 -