NEERAJA BHARATKUMAR TAPARIA
-
About NEERAJA BHARATKUMAR TAPARIA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27200MH1979PTC021078 ADITI HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 2000500.0 Active 20/11/2003 - U29190MH1940PTC003118 NARENDRA UDYOG PVT LTD 900000.0 Active 10/11/2003 - U51900MH1985PLC035161 SIMCO TRADING AND FINANCE CO LTD 9800000.0 Active 10/11/2003 - U65990MH1960PTC011852 KIRAN INVESTMENT CO PRIVATE LIMITED 315000.0 Active 03/02/2003 - U65990MH1974PTC017736 DEVASHISH INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 20/11/2003 - U67120MH1974PTC017931 TAPARIA INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 20/11/2003 - U67129MH1981PTC024036 DIVYA HOLDINGS PVT LTD 3750200.0 Active 04/01/1982 - -
Associated with Directors
BHARATKUMAR TAPARIA Director MAHESH CHANDRA SHARMA Director KRISHNA KUMAR MAHESHWARI Director