NAVRATAN AGGARWAL
-
About NAVRATAN AGGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U00000DL2000PTC108398 VGB TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/03/2013 - U14102RJ2013PTC041554 FIVE ELEMENTS GRANITES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/02/2013 - U15202DL2004PTC128588 SHREE LALJI ENERGY FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 30000000.0 Active 05/06/2006 - U45201DL2005PTC138594 SP HI-FY REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 50000000.0 Active 14/05/2008 - U45400DL2013PTC259838 RADIANT RESIDENCY PRIVATE LIMITED 2100000.0 Active 05/09/2014 - U55101DL2012PTC237896 RANIL HOTELS & RESORT PRIVATE LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 10/12/2014 - U70102DL2014PTC264007 SAAVY REALTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/01/2014 - U70109DL2011PTC219410 AVIGHNA ASSOCIATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/02/2016 - U70109DL2011PTC228388 NSA SOUL BUILDWELL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/12/2011 - U70109DL2013PTC258441 YAVI CONSTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/09/2013 - U70200DL2010PTC201722 SHRI DWARKAPATI BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/03/2011 - U70200DL2011PTC217325 TRUZZO PROMOTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/04/2011 - U74899DL1988PTC033644 BIKANERVALA FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 8500000.0 Active 26/07/2001 - -
Associated with Directors