NAILESH PRIYAKANT DALAL
-
About NAILESH PRIYAKANT DALAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51100MH2005PTC152120 DALAL AND BROACHA COMMODITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 22/03/2005 - U65990MH1991PTC060877 NEELHARI HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 102000.0 Active 22/03/1991 - U67120MH1995PTC085429 CENTRAL FINANCE SECURITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 3008000.0 Active 25/11/1998 - U67120MH1997PTC111186 DALAL AND BROACHA STOCK BROKING PRIVATE LIMITED 65000000.0 Active 09/10/1997 - -
Associated with Directors
VIPUL PRIYAKANT DALAL Director HIREN HIRALAL SHAH Director PARIMAL RAMESHCHANDRA MERCHANT Director