NANDAN VITHAL YALGI
-
About NANDAN VITHAL YALGI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15330KA2008PLC047205 SHREE RENUKA AGRI VENTURES LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 21/07/2009 - U15420MH2002PLC135111 RATNAPRABHA SUGARS LIMITED 1500000.0 Amalgamated 23/07/2008 - U23201MH2003PTC140551 GODAVARI BIOFUEL PRIVATE LIMITED 460000.0 Amalgamated 23/07/2008 - U40102KA2008PLC045442 SHREE RENUKA ENERGY LIMITED 1128990000.0 Amalgamated 28/02/2008 - U45205KA2013PTC067486 SHREE RENUKA TUNAPORT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/01/2013 - U51502MH2006PTC163752 MONICA TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/06/2010 - U51909KA2007PLC041567 VANTAMURI TRADING AND INVESTMENTS LIMITED 170000000.0 Active 24/01/2007 - U65910KA1997PTC022644 KHANDEPAR INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 12500000.0 Active 19/06/2014 - U67190KA1994PTC016076 MURKUMBI INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 3130600.0 Active 19/06/2014 - U74999MH2011PTC219222 BOXCO LOGISTICS INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 351392000.0 Active 01/01/2017 - U74999MH2016PTC285846 FALCON SUGARS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 14/09/2016 - -
Associated with Directors