NARENDER MUKHARAIYA
-
About NARENDER MUKHARAIYA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400DL2011PTC218116 SANTUSHTI INFRACON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/10/2012 - U51900MH1992PTC068452 MAMTA MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 4250000.0 Active 08/05/2014 - U51900MH1993PTC073633 EKTA IMPEX P LTD 3500000.0 Active 30/06/1999 - U55101UP1992PTC014937 PITAMBER HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 102000.0 Active 20/03/1998 - U58939MH1990PTC058939 SALASAR MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 8392000.0 Active 11/06/2014 - U67120MH1993PTC071340 SANKUL HOLDINGS PVT LTD 3500000.0 Active 08/05/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
POONAM SHARMA Director DEVENDRA KUMAR GUPTA Director ANURAG SHARMA Director