NARENDRA SHANTILAL LODHA
-
About NARENDRA SHANTILAL LODHA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L29150MH1946PLC004877 CAPRIHANS INDIA LIMITED 131339710.0 Active 22/09/2017 - U45200MH1983PTC029302 SUSME BUILDERS PVT LTD 100000000.0 Active 28/02/2006 - U45200MH1986PTC038862 PRIME PROPERTIES PVT LTD 4028000.0 Active 31/03/2015 - U45200MH1996PTC103763 KALPATARU LAND PRIVATE LIMITED 10900000.0 Active 01/02/2008 - U45200MH2007PLC173306 AMBER REAL ESTATE LIMITED 9900000.0 Active 01/02/2008 - U45200MH2007PTC167182 ASHOKA PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 900000.0 Amalgamated 01/02/2008 - U45201MH2002PTC134396 ANANTA LANDMARKS PRIVATE LIMITED 49170000.0 Active 15/12/2008 - U45201MH2006PLC166598 SAICHARAN PROPERTIES LIMITED 500500000.0 Active 01/02/2008 - U45201MH2007PTC173899 ARDOUR REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 6950000.0 Amalgamated 01/02/2008 - U45201RJ2006PTC023148 SWARN BHUMI TOWNSHIP PRIVATE LIMITED 5200020.0 Active 28/09/2007 - U45201RJ2007PTC024702 GIRIRAJKRIPA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 300000.0 Active 30/03/2010 - U45203MH2007PTC176643 ARIMAS DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 5900000.0 Active 04/03/2011 - U45203MH2008PTC181807 KALPATARU LANDMARKS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/05/2008 - U45203MH2008PTC181811 KANANI PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/05/2008 - U45300MH2008PTC178011 ARDOUR DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 900000.0 Active 14/11/2017 - U51909MH2003PTC141813 SFURTI MULTITRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U51909MH2003PTC141918 SFURTI IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U58628MH1990PTC058628 KALPATARU PROPERTIES (THANE) PRIVATE LIMITED 97500000.0 Active 28/03/2015 - U70102MH2007PTC173337 ABACUS REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 7900000.0 Active 20/07/2017 - U70102MH2008PTC177239 AGILE REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 14/12/2011 - U74999MH1994PTC077860 KLASSIK VINYL PRODUCTS PVT LTD 15000000.0 Converted to LLP 30/03/2015 - U99999MH1953PLC009100 DYNACRAFT MACHINE COMPANY LIMITED 9961600.0 Active 30/03/2015 - -
Associated with Directors