NARENDER KUMAR TAYAL
-
About NARENDER KUMAR TAYAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15491RJ1997PTC014388 SHREE BHARTARI TEA HOUSE PRIVATE LIMITED 654200.0 Active 03/11/1997 - U45201RJ2014PTC044985 SHRI GOKULESH DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 31/01/2014 - U70101RJ2012PTC038015 SWASTIK GREEN CITY PRIVATE LIMITED 178000.0 Active 16/01/2018 - U70101RJ2012PTC039012 SHRI GOKULESH INFRA CORPORATION PRIVATE LIMITED 106000.0 Active 23/05/2012 -