NIRMAL KUMAR SHUKLA
-
About NIRMAL KUMAR SHUKLA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51109WB1995PTC068993 LYONS RANGE DEALER PVT. LTD. 9271250.0 Active 31/01/2007 - U51398WB1993PTC057665 QUALITY VINIMAY PVT. LTD. 6669200.0 Active 24/08/2001 - U51909WB2005PTC103619 TRISTAR TIE-UP PRIVATE LIMITED 734000.0 Active 30/04/2009 - U67120WB1991PTC051513 RUDHRA MERCANTILE PVT. LTD. 998000.0 Active 26/09/2005 - U67120WB1992PTC055128 MEERA MOHAN INVESTMENT PVT LTD 1597000.0 Active 01/03/2005 - -
Associated with Directors
RUP SHANKER MEHTA Director SATYENDRA KUMAR SINGH Director RAJ KUMAR JHA Director PANKAJ YAGNICK Director