NEELAM KOTHARI
-
About NEELAM KOTHARI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45202DL1999PTC100677 KOTHARI EDUCATION INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 01/08/2012 - U74120DL1986PLC025842 INTERSTAR FINANCIAL SERVICES LIMITED. 24785000.0 Active 23/10/1986 - U74899DL1995PTC073500 INTERSTAR HOME DECOR PRIVATE LIMITED 2150000.0 Active 30/10/1995 - U80903DL2008NPL184192 SHUGAN CHANDRA KOTHARI EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 13/10/2008 - -
Associated with Directors
PRIYA SHANKAR DASGUPTA Director DINESH CHANDRA KOTHARI Director