NIKHIL VARDHAN BUBNA
-
About NIKHIL VARDHAN BUBNA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U17110MH1978PTC020176 BUBNA COMMODITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 2450000.0 Active 27/09/2007 - U17110MH1979PTC021511 VARDHAN SILK MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 3402500.0 Active 27/09/2007 - U17120MH1981PTC024922 N KUMAR COMMODITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 2425000.0 Active 27/09/2007 - U45200MH1993PTC072652 BUSH CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/08/1994 - U45200MH2004PTC150092 DIVINE PIKANED CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/12/2004 - U51900MH1985PTC035340 POLESTAR EXIM PVT LTD 500000.0 Active 01/03/1988 - U51900MH1992PTC064761 SHEKHAWATI EXIM P LTD 1000000.0 Active 27/09/2007 - -
Associated with Directors
RAMESH BABULAL BUBNA Director SUVARNA JAYARAM RANE Director ANITA NIKHIL VARDHAN BUBNA Director