NAGALINGAM JAYAMURUGAN
-
About NAGALINGAM JAYAMURUGAN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15421AP1994PLC019013 SNJ SUGARS AND PRODUCTS LIMITED 700000000.0 Active 18/10/2011 - U15530TN2008PTC067388 SNJ DISTILLERS PRIVATE LIMITED 15000000.0 Active 17/04/2008 - U15530TN2009PTC072357 SNJ BREWERIES PRIVATE LIMITED 150000000.0 Active 23/07/2009 - U26919PY2000PTC001559 LEELA DISTILLERIES PRIVATE LIMITED 900000.0 Active 22/06/2009 - U45200TN2008PTC066837 NJM INFRASTRUCTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 17/03/2008 - U45200TN2008PTC070095 NJM PROMOTERS AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/12/2008 - U45203TN2007PTC062977 NANDHINI INFRASTRUCTURE AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 18520700.0 Active 03/04/2007 - U45203TN2007PTC063053 PAVITHRA INFRASTRUCTURE AND DEVELOPMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 4412000.0 Active 10/04/2007 - U45203TN2007PTC063109 JAY GEE HITECH INFRAVENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 10345670.0 Active 16/04/2007 - U45203TN2007PTC063266 ANITHA INFRASTRUCTURE AND PROPERTY DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 10660000.0 Active 24/04/2007 - U51109TN2010PLC076966 INDIAN LOTTERY DISTRIBUTION LIMITED. 500000.0 Active 11/08/2010 - U51900TN2010PLC077946 GAMING INDIA DISTRIBUTOR LIMITED. 5500000.0 Active 02/11/2011 - U55101TN2008PTC067318 SNJ INN PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/04/2008 - U70101TN2009PTC070537 SNJ PROMOTERS AND PROPERTY DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/01/2009 - U70101TN2009PTC070912 JAY GEE ESTATES & FOUNDATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/03/2009 - U70102TN2008PTC066856 SNJ INFRASTRUCTURE PROPERTY DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 17/03/2008 - U70102TN2008PTC070181 SNJ ESTATES AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/12/2008 - U70102TN2011PTC079945 PAVITHRA PROPERTY DEVELOPER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 31/03/2011 - U70102TN2011PTC080509 ANITHA ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/05/2011 - U70109TN2011PTC080089 NANDHINI PROPERTY AND DEVELOPER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/04/2011 - -
Associated with Directors