NANDYALA VENKATA SUBBA RAJU
-
About NANDYALA VENKATA SUBBA RAJU,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U41000TG2007PTC053366 CANDOR AQUA FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 28/03/2007 - U51503TG1996PTC024921 NINESTAR ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 3217000.0 Active 24/11/2011 - U65993TG1984PLC004752 RAASI GROWTH FUND LTD 4692500.0 Active 19/08/1986 - U65993TG1991PTC012827 SHRAVAN FINANCE AND ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 6434200.0 Active 26/02/1993 -