NAVNEETKUMAR KRISHNAGOPAL MUNDRA
-
About NAVNEETKUMAR KRISHNAGOPAL MUNDRA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15400GJ2012PTC072277 SHRI MERRITS AGRO INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 105000.0 Active 10/10/2012 - U17110GJ1990PTC014330 SHRI MADHUSUDAN DYEING AND PRINTING MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 6000500.0 Active 15/03/2005 - U17120MH2009PTC196177 MADHUSUDAN FILAMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/10/2009 - U17291GJ2012PTC071505 MADHUSUDAN THREADS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/08/2012 - U74994GJ2006PTC048513 SUDAMO IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED 17187100.0 Active 01/04/2015 -