NIKITA AGARWAL
-
About NIKITA AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15410MH2004PTC149049 HARSH BAKERS PRIVATE LIMITED 14550000.0 Active 01/08/2009 - U15413WB2002PTC094798 KRISHNA BAKERS PRIVATE LIMITED 2000000.0 Active 25/05/2006 - U51420WB1987PTC042025 UNISTAR RESOURCES AND TRADES PVT LTD 10000000.0 Active 22/06/2010 - U51900WB2009PTC132094 AANGAD VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 4980000.0 Active 09/01/2013 - -
Associated with Directors
MAHESH KUMAR AGARWAL Director VINITA AGARWAL Director VIVEK AGARWAL Director USHA DEVI AGARWAL Director