NEETU AGARWAL
-
About NEETU AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27109WB2010PTC150602 STEELEX PIPES PRIVATE LIMITED 570000.0 Active 23/06/2010 - U27310WB2010PTC152685 A.G.FERRO CAST PRIVATE LIMITED 1360000.0 Active 31/08/2010 - U51109WB2007PTC119409 MAYFAIR COMMOTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 2940000.0 Active 03/05/2010 - U51909WB2007PTC120897 SAMPURN BARTER PRIVATE LIMITED 1620000.0 Active 17/01/2018 - U51909WB2010PTC155097 MANGAL MURTI SALES PRIVATE LIMITED 676000.0 Active 17/01/2018 - U74120WB2010PTC149384 AMBROSE COMMOTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 700000.0 Active 17/01/2018 - -
Associated with Directors
SANJAY KUMAR AGARWAL Director RUCHI AGARWAL Director PINKI GOENKA Director MEHUL AGARWAL Director