NILESH YADAV
-
About NILESH YADAV,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400WB2007PTC116082 CRYSTAL ABASAN PRIVATE LIMITED 479000.0 Active 24/11/2014 - U51109WB2008PTC123928 BRILLIANT VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 1837200.0 Active 21/02/2017 - U70102WB2014PTC200006 RIDICULE HOUSING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 19/01/2015 - U74999WB2012PTC180213 NAGKESAR VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 100900.0 Active 22/02/2017 - U74999WB2012PTC180279 SHAKTIMATA DEALCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 100900.0 Active 21/02/2017 - U74999WB2012PTC180349 GUNINA TRADELINKS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 24/11/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
SARKAR ASIT Director PRAVIN PANKAJ Director SUJIT NASKAR Director JITENDRA KUMAR MODI Director