NYRIKA HOLKAR
-
About NYRIKA HOLKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U28993MH1932PLC001828 GODREJ AND BOYCE MANUFACTURING COMPANY LIMITED 67844500.0 Active 01/04/2017 - U32100MH1997PLC106135 GODREJ INFOTECH LIMITED 970000.0 Active 14/07/2017 - U63090MH2014PTC258741 UMOJA TRAVELS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/08/2016 - U70102MH2007PTC171810 MUKTESHWAR REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 2640420.0 Active 10/12/2014 - U73200MH1986NPL041521 CENTRE FOR ADVANCEMENT OF PHILANTHROPY. 0.0 Active 01/04/2015 - U85300TG2011NPL076679 JALDHAARA FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 01/03/2016 - -
Associated with Directors