NARCINVA GURUDAS BENE
-
About NARCINVA GURUDAS BENE,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51420GA1993PTC001353 SALGAOCAR METALS AND MINERALS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/03/2015 - U55204MH2016PTC274078 VMSALGAOCAR INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 09/03/2016 - U63040GA1999PTC002759 AERO MUNDIAL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/03/2015 - U65921GA1994PTC001597 GREAT LAKE FINANCE AND LEASING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/07/2017 - U65993GA1981PTC000432 SHIVRANJANI INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 22/07/2017 - U70101GA1990PTC001027 PURATAN REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/08/2016 - U70101GA2009PTC006091 VMSALGAOCAR REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/03/2015 - U70200GA2008PTC005715 AMONA INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/08/2016 - -
Associated with Directors