OM PRAKASH KUNDANLAL DEGAN
-
About OM PRAKASH KUNDANLAL DEGAN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24100MH1972PTC016136 OSNAR CHEMICAL PRIVATE LIMITED 9540000.0 Active 22/11/1972 - U24100MH1981PTC024909 OMNI POLYMERS AND CHEMICALS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/08/1981 - U29120MH1974PTC017187 OSNAR PIPE COATING PRIVATE LIMITED 225000.0 Active 11/02/1974 - U45402MH1965PTC013361 OSNAR PAINTS AND CONTRACTS PRIVATE LIMITED 7000000.0 Active 12/11/1965 - -
Associated with Directors
SAMIR OMPRAKASH DEGAN Director ASHOK KRISHNANAND SHASTRY Director SHALINI SAMIR DEGAN Director