PATANJALI GOVIND KESWANI
-
About PATANJALI GOVIND KESWANI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L74899DL1968PLC004962 SALORA INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 88145000.0 Active 28/10/2005 - U17291DL2007PTC169517 CROW REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/10/2007 - U45200DL2006PTC156838 TOUCAN REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/12/2006 - U45200DL2010PTC210719 OCEANUS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/11/2010 - U45400DL2007PTC169551 MYNA REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/10/2007 - U55101DL2002PTC117862 UNISTAR HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/12/2002 - U55101DL2002PTC118180 CARNATION HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 35934580.0 Active 24/12/2002 - U55101DL2003PTC207912 FLEUR HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 592862530.0 Active 09/05/2012 - U55101DL2004PTC130720 TANGERINE HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 5715750.0 Amalgamated 23/11/2004 - U55101DL2005PTC138835 SPANK HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 16243000.0 Amalgamated 01/06/2006 - U55101DL2007PTC158376 LEMON TREE HOTEL COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED. 350000.0 Active 24/01/2007 - U55101DL2008PTC180471 GARNET HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/07/2008 - U55101DL2008PTC185932 ASTER HOTELS & RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 5671759.0 Amalgamated 18/12/2008 - U55204DL2007PTC157848 RED FOX HOTEL COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED. 300000.0 Active 13/01/2007 - U70101DL2008PTC184833 PRN MANAGEMENT SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 2472000.0 Amalgamated 11/11/2008 - U70102DL2008PTC184115 BUZZARD REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/10/2008 - U74120DL2007PTC168778 SPARROW BUILDWELL PRIVATE LIMITED 2873875.0 Active 28/09/2007 - U74140DL2004PTC130400 SPANK MANAGEMENT SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 390000.0 Active 05/11/2004 - U74140DL2008PTC184113 VULTURE MANAGEMENT SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/10/2008 - U74899DL1992PLC049022 LEMON TREE HOTELS LIMITED 7864126830.0 Active 07/10/2002 - U80904DL2011PTC222680 HEADSTART INSTITUTE PRIVATE LIMITED 16016000.0 Amalgamated 22/07/2011 - -
Associated with Directors