PRASAHESH ARYA
-
About PRASAHESH ARYA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L65910DL1992PLC049566 SMC CREDITS LIMITED. 100222000.0 Active 08/01/2001 - L70109WB1983PLC036189 VALOUR CONSTRUCTION LTD 55007700.0 Active 24/01/2000 - U28910DL2008PLC185040 JBM MOTORS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 31/03/2015 - U45200DL1993PTC054079 SAMMAN PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 27850200.0 Active 02/05/2000 - U45200DL2007PTC162075 GREEN LAND TECHNOBUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 71100000.0 Active 15/06/2015 - U45200DL2008PTC178619 JBM PROJECTS & INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 69000000.0 Active 31/03/2015 - U45204DL2007PTC159448 ROYAL INFRAREALITY PRIVATE LIMITED 340000.0 Active 10/03/2010 - U65990DL1996PLC076007 HITESHA FINANCE AND INVESTMENT LIMITED 5716200.0 Active 02/02/1996 - U74140DL2011PTC227157 JBM CORPORATE SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 26446470.0 Active 29/11/2016 - U74899DL1993PTC053196 NAP INVESTMENT & LEASING PRIVATE LIMITED 5263000.0 Active 22/04/1993 - U74899DL1994PLC058097 FOCAL LEASING AND CREDITS LIMITED. 49867000.0 Active 14/02/2001 - -
Associated with Directors