PRAMENDRA TOMAR
-
About PRAMENDRA TOMAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24297DL2007PTC162027 AMIT DYECHEM PRIVATE LIMITED 750000.0 Active 11/12/2013 - U35110TN1985PTC012326 KAILASH SHIPPING SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 90000000.0 Active 23/11/2015 - U45201DL2005PTC133065 GLOBAL PROPMART PRIVATE LIMITED 2400000.0 Active 27/03/2017 - U51101DL2006PTC156638 ADSAL EXIM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/12/2014 - U65100DL1998PLC095123 COSMIC INVESTMENTS LIMITED 4800070.0 Active 19/02/2004 - U72200DL1999PTC099475 VINAYAK INFOSYS PRIVATE LIMITED 1500000.0 Active 17/10/2006 - U72200DL2013PTC256397 HICANE TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 08/08/2013 - U74140DL1998PTC096019 SARGAM CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 14500000.0 Active 17/04/2017 - U74140DL2004PTC125425 AANCHAL CONSULTANCY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 20/03/2009 - U74140DL2012PTC244821 AIL CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/03/2017 - U74140DL2012PTC244852 OSK HOLDINGS (AIL) PRIVATE LIMITED 30100000.0 Active 27/03/2017 - U74140DL2014PLC267725 APOLLO INTERNATIONAL PROEX LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 30/05/2014 - U74899DL1994PLC062313 AMAZER INVESTMENT AND FINANCE LIMITED 27288070.0 Active 04/12/2017 -