PRAVEEN AGARWAL
-
About PRAVEEN AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24290DL1987PTC028569 PRANAV VIKAS (INDIA ) PRIVATE LIMITED 34000000.0 Active 01/04/1995 - U27203MH2005PLC151845 PACIFIC ALLOYS LIMITED 9972000.0 Active 08/02/2008 - U27310DL2004PTC131667 RPS VIKAS CASTINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 188878000.0 Amalgamated 29/12/2004 - U29306DL1981PTC012616 S. S. N. INTERNATIONAL PRIVATE LIMITED 1725000.0 Active 09/11/1981 - U31909DL2017PTC325212 JS TECH VIKAS (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/10/2017 - U34506DL1996PTC079231 KESELEC LIGHTING PRIVATE LIMITED 13335100.0 Active 16/02/2016 - U45202DL1982PTC014381 SANDEN VIKAS (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 296250000.0 Active 23/09/1982 - U74899DL1989PTC034640 SUMEDHA IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED 3500000.0 Active 04/06/2007 - U74899DL1991PTC044234 ECOCAT (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED. 65621860.0 Active 17/07/1995 - U74899DL1998PTC091512 KENMORE VIKAS (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 12700000.0 Active 05/01/1998 - -
Associated with Directors