PARVINDER SINGH GAHLAUT
-
About PARVINDER SINGH GAHLAUT,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U00300BR1986PLC002370 SRI KRISHNA FERTILISERS LIMITED 3208000.0 Active 29/05/2014 - U14219TN1955PLC000961 INDIAN POTASH LIMITED 142986000.0 Active 29/09/1997 - U15122DL2011PLC217940 IPL SUGARS AND ALLIED INDUSTRIES LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 21/04/2011 - U15203HR1992PLC034058 GOLDLINE MILKFOOD AND ALLIED INDUSTRIES LIMITED 6942600.0 Active 17/10/2001 - U60232DL2016PLC300872 IFFCO CRWC LOGISTICS LIMITED 43700000.0 Active 03/06/2016 - U74899DL2000PLC107621 IFFCO-TOKIO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED 2693215000.0 Active 22/03/2010 - U74900TN2011PLC080295 IPL GUJARAT PORT LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 25/04/2011 - U85300DL1955NPL002999 THE FERTILISER ASSOCIATION OF INDIA. 0.0 Active 11/12/1998 - -
Associated with Directors