PAWAN SHARMA
-
About PAWAN SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400DL1953PTC002254 THE CAPITAL HOUSING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/07/2007 - U45901DL1996PTC080976 SHIV MURTI ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 06/08/1996 - U63040DL1995PTC070290 HILTON INFRATECH PRIVATE LIMITED 121300.0 Active 27/12/2012 - U70101DL2011PTC229378 MURLIDHAR INFRACON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/05/2012 - U70102DL2014PTC273873 VINZEAL DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/12/2014 - U70102DL2015PTC277547 YASHICA PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 05/03/2015 - U70109DL2011PTC218776 LUTENS FARM HOUSES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/05/2011 - U70109DL2015PTC277254 NABANIPA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 26/02/2015 - U70109DL2015PTC277702 IDHA PROCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 09/03/2015 - U70200DL2010PTC204317 LAVANYA BUILDPRO PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/03/2017 - U70200DL2015PTC277548 YASHILA BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 05/03/2015 - U74899DL1994PTC061443 PREMIER PORTFOLIO PRIVATE LIMITED 110200.0 Active 10/04/2015 - U74899DL1995PTC069855 SHIV MURTI DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 17/06/1995 - -
Associated with Directors