PAWAN KUMAR AGGARWAL
-
About PAWAN KUMAR AGGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40109DL2008PLC177309 KEI POWER LIMITED. 500000.0 Active 28/04/2008 - U51901DL1999PTC098304 SOUBHAGYA AGENCY PRIVATE LIMITED 102000.0 Active 14/02/2007 - U51901DL1999PTC098692 DHAN VERSHA AGENCY PRIVATE LIMITED 302000.0 Active 18/07/2001 - U74899DL1994PLC061674 KEI INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 1904760.0 Active 01/10/1997 - U74899DL1994PTC063664 PROJECTION FINANCIAL & MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/06/2013 - U74899DL1998PTC094919 SHUBH LAXMI MOTELS AND INNS PRIVATE LIMITED 102000.0 Active 07/01/2004 - -
Associated with Directors
ANIL GUPTA Director ARCHANA GUPTA Director SATI NATH DAS Director