PRADEEP KUMAR SARAF
-
About PRADEEP KUMAR SARAF,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27108WB2003PTC189367 SMITA ISPAT PRIVATE LIMITED 550000.0 Active 01/11/2006 - U45200WB1986PTC040480 DOVER PROPERTIES PVT LTD 82661590.0 Active 08/04/1986 - U50103WB1946PLC013162 JAIDKA MOTOR CO LTD 1000000.0 Active 20/01/2011 - U51109WB1995PTC069271 JANPRAGATI DISTRIBUTORS PVT.LTD. 512000.0 Active 12/05/1995 - U51109WB2006PTC107602 LAKE VIEW SUPPLIERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 14/02/2007 - U51909WB1994PTC064595 CALCUTTA VINCOM PVT.LTD. 356450.0 Active 07/11/1994 - U51909WB1994PTC065977 DIMPLE VINCOM PVT LTD 30076700.0 Active 02/06/1997 - U51909WB1995PTC069333 ASCENT TRADING PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 11/01/2006 - U67120WB1989PTC045900 NIHARIKA ESTATES PVT LTD 455200.0 Active 15/03/2001 - U70101WB1987PTC043006 SHRI GANGA BHAGIRATHI COMMERCIAL PROJECTS PVT LTD 2712500.0 Active 14/09/1991 - U70101WB1989PTC046202 ACHLA PROPERTIES PVT LTD 100000.0 Amalgamated 19/07/1996 - U70101WB1989PTC046204 AMOD PROPERTIES PVT LTD 100000.0 Amalgamated 19/07/1996 - U70101WB1989PTC046206 ANUGRAH PROPERTIES PVT LTD 100000.0 Amalgamated 19/07/1994 - U70101WB1989PTC046207 CHAKRAPANI PROPERTIES PVT LTD 100000.0 Amalgamated 19/07/1996 - U70101WB1989PTC046214 ANSHUMATI PROPERTIES PVT LTD 100000.0 Amalgamated 15/07/1996 - U70101WB1989PTC046227 CHATURMAN PROPERTIES PVT LTD 100000.0 Amalgamated 30/10/1992 - U70101WB1995PTC071725 GURUMANTRAYA PROPERTIES PRIVATE LTD. 1302000.0 Active 22/05/1995 - U70101WB1996PTC076295 GANGESH PROPERTIES PVT LTD 608200.0 Active 01/01/1996 - U70101WB1996PTC076402 AISAWAT HOUSING PVT.LTD. 580200.0 Active 25/01/1996 - U70109WB1989PTC046136 AGAM PROPERTIES PVT LTD 100000.0 Amalgamated 19/07/1996 - U70109WB1989PTC046138 CHANDRASEKHAR PROPERTIES PVT LTD. 200000.0 Amalgamated 19/07/1996 - U70109WB2009PTC139189 TARINI MATA PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/02/2018 - U74140WB2009PTC134608 RICHBIRDS DRINKING WATER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/05/2017 - -
Associated with Directors