PRAVIN AGARWAL
-
About PRAVIN AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U10100DL1997PLC088312 VENKATESH COKE AND POWER LIMITED 43225620.0 Active 25/10/1998 - U51101DL2007PTC158283 INVESTIN ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 30/01/2007 - U51909DL1984PTC017991 RPM MARKETING PRIVATE LTD 1000000.0 Active 26/07/1989 - U70109DL2009PTC189050 PETAL RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 470000.0 Active 01/04/2009 - U74899DL1990PTC039016 RPM BUSINESS SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 400000.0 Active 23/01/1990 - U74999DL2009PTC192636 PETAL CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 1220000.0 Active 28/07/2009 -