PAWAN KUMAR LILA
-
About PAWAN KUMAR LILA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27209DL1988PTC032849 SHREE ALUMINIUM PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 18/08/1988 - U70101GA1996PTC002075 LILA ALUMINIUM INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 25000100.0 Active 12/03/2015 - U74899DL1985PTC019903 GLORY STEELS PRIVATE LIMITED 290000.0 Active 28/03/1997 - U74899DL1987PTC028242 LILA ASSOCIATES PRIVATE LTD. 7500000.0 Active 05/04/1997 - -
Associated with Directors
RAM LAL AGGARWAL Director MAHESH KUMAR LILA Director ISHIIT LILAA Director SULOCHANA DEVI LILA Director