PREMNATH BANARSIDAS AGARWAL
-
About PREMNATH BANARSIDAS AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U65990MH1994PTC078489 KUNVARDA INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 19/05/1994 - U65990MH1994PTC078527 ADITYA AGARWAL INVESTMENTS (BOMBAY) PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/05/1994 - U67120MH1996PTC098787 NIFTY HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/04/1996 - U67120MH1996PTC098788 EMBLEM HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/04/1996 - U67120MH1996PTC098818 GAIETY HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/04/1996 - -
Associated with Directors
ARVIND PREMNATH AGARWAL Director GAUTAM ARVIND AGARWAL Director ADITYA ARVIND AGARWAL Director