PIYA PURI
-
About PIYA PURI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U29268DL1991PTC045962 MPA INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 20374000.0 Active 10/01/2004 - U52100DL2013PTC253735 MELIORATE SOFTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/06/2013 - U64203DL2007PTC159268 APS TELECOM SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/02/2014 - U65929DL1994PTC060645 PENINSULA CREDIT FACTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 120300.0 Active 17/02/2014 - U65993DL1992PLC048030 PENINSULA LEASING FINANCE AND INVESTMENT COMPANY LTD 520700.0 Active 17/02/2014 - U67190DL2007PTC159207 APS HOLDING PRIVATE LIMITED 150000.0 Active 17/02/2014 - U74140DL2000PTC103929 A P SECURITAS INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 100200.0 Active 17/02/2014 - U74140DL2010PTC202266 ZEUS MANAGEMENT SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 27700000.0 Active 17/02/2014 - U74899DL1984PTC019420 SUPER SAFEWAYS PRIVATE LIMITED 180000.0 Active 17/02/2014 - U74910PB2004PTC027525 PENINSULA MANAGEMENT SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/09/2004 - U74920DL2003PTC123218 ABACUS SECURITY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/02/2014 - U74920DL2004PTC127449 APS SECURITY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/02/2014 - U74920DL2008PTC185465 APS ELITE SECURITY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/02/2014 - U74990DL2009PTC193315 PROTON FACILITY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 49200000.0 Active 17/02/2014 - U74999DL2005PTC135214 PENINSULA DATA SECURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/02/2014 - U93000DL2010PTC201716 VIJAYANT FACILITY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
ANIL PURI Director MALLIKA PURI Director PRAVEER BAGCHI Director ASHWIN KAMAL ADVANI Director