PRAVIN SHIVDAS HERLEKAR
-
About PRAVIN SHIVDAS HERLEKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L24110MH2005PLC151589 OMKAR SPECIALITY CHEMICALS LIMITED 205780000.0 Active 24/02/2005 - U24100MH1986PTC040668 URDHWA CHEMICALS COMPANY PVT LTD 35444000.0 Active 10/07/2012 - U24110MH1995PLC088969 RISHICHEM RESEARCH LIMITED 540000.0 Active 30/05/2005 - U24111MH1983PTC031424 DESH CHEMICALS PVT LTD 495000.0 Active 10/07/2012 - U24230MH2003PTC141395 SVAKS BIOTECH INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 250000.0 Active 22/11/2012 - U24297MH1998PTC114317 LASA LABORATORY PRIVATE LIMITED 59500000.0 Active 09/05/2012 - -
Associated with Directors