PURUSHOTTAM MURARKA
-
About PURUSHOTTAM MURARKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27101AR2003PLC007016 SMS SMELTERS LIMITED 153499990.0 Active 25/02/2004 - U27101ML2002PTC006866 MEGHALAYA ALLOYS PRIVATE LIMITED 10020000.0 Active 22/03/2010 - U27104GJ2003PTC042601 OMKARESHWAR STEEL AND ALLOYS PRIVATE LIMITED 23500000.0 Active 10/07/2003 - U27106ML2001PTC006631 SATYA MEGHA ISPAT PRIVATE LIMITED 39200000.0 Active 01/10/2002 - U27109ML1996PTC004815 SATYAM STEELS AND ALLOYS PVT LTD 8249700.0 Active 15/07/2002 - U51909AS2008PTC008683 SEEMA COMMERCIALS PRIVATE LIMITED 7600000.0 Active 27/05/2008 - U70101AS2006PTC008109 SATYAM BUILTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 8100000.0 Active 13/04/2006 - U74120AS2008PTC011831 SAMRAT FINCON PRIVATE LIMITED 10025000.0 Active 27/05/2010 - U74899WB1995PLC130823 NISHU LEASING AND FINANCE LIMITED 27885550.0 Active 11/05/2010 - U74899WB1995PTC132699 ANAMIKA CAPITAL FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 17415000.0 Active 24/05/2010 - -
Associated with Directors