PREM SHANKAR DUBEY
-
About PREM SHANKAR DUBEY,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U17299WB2010PTC152666 M&W FASHION PRIVATE LIMITED 3899000.0 Active 28/06/2012 - U45400WB2010PTC142523 SHREE CONCLAVE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/02/2010 - U45400WB2010PTC142524 SHREE HIGHRISE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/02/2010 - U51109WB2008PTC124316 SHREE REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 02/04/2008 - U51109WB2008PTC128310 SUBHDHAN MERCHANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/07/2010 - U51909WB2002PLC095529 SHREE SHOPPERS LTD 21852000.0 Active 18/12/2002 - U63090WB1997PLC083964 SHREE PARIVAHAN LIMITED 2825000.0 Active 28/12/2002 - U70102WB2010PTC153721 SHREE SKYCRAPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/10/2010 - U70102WB2010PTC153722 SHREE CASTLE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/10/2010 - U70102WB2010PTC153723 SHREE FORT PRIVATE LIMITED 1834800.0 Active 01/10/2010 - U70109WB1952PTC020489 BKD INFRAPROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 1016000.0 Active 26/12/2011 - U74899WB1993PTC129468 BD FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 1257000.0 Active 10/11/2010 - U74999WB2009PTC138094 SHREE RESIDENCY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 31/08/2009 - -
Associated with Directors
BINAY KUMAR DUBEY Director PRAKASH DHALLA Director ANJALI DUBEY Director