PURAN MAL AGRAWAL
-
About PURAN MAL AGRAWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L51909WB1986PLC040201 ASHIRWAD STEELS & INDUSTRIES LTD 125000000.0 Active 26/12/1992 - U10100WB2008PTC121407 MSP COKES PRIVATE LIMITED 39090000.0 Amalgamated 03/01/2008 - U14219WB2006PTC112186 PRATEEK MINES & MINERALS PRIVATE LIMITED 895000.0 Active 29/09/2016 - U21092WB1985PLC038866 ADHUNIK GASES LTD. 43930350.0 Active 30/04/1985 - U26942WB2006PLC134436 MSP FERRO AND POWER LIMITED 700000.0 Active 27/09/2016 - U27106WB1993PTC058564 RAMA ALLOYS PVT LTD 14578000.0 Active 15/04/1993 - U27109WB1996PLC082138 MSP METALLICS LIMITED 824790120.0 Active 28/11/2001 - U27109WB1997PLC085253 MSP STEELS LTD. 56496000.0 Amalgamated 22/08/1997 - U28991WB1976PTC030724 ILEX PVT LTD 222137400.0 Active 26/04/2011 - U40104WB2008PLC124772 MSP ENERGY LIMITED 6750000.0 Active 04/04/2008 - U40106WB2008PLC123052 MSP POWER LIMITED 600000.0 Active 25/02/2008 - U51109WB1995PTC068525 VICONIC MERCHANTS PVT.LTD. 20474000.0 Active 29/04/2009 - U65929WB1996PTC117344 SANEE CAPITAL AND LEASING PVT LTD 36589000.0 Active 17/05/2007 - U67120WB1993PLC059600 RAJ SECURITIES LIMITED 70893000.0 Active 29/05/2000 - -
Associated with Directors