PREETI BIDASARIA
-
About PREETI BIDASARIA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400WB2009PTC135115 GANGOTRI TOWERS PRIVATE LIMITED 999840.0 Active 08/03/2010 - U51101WB2010PTC147901 EFFECTIVE VANIJYA PRIVATE LIMITED 423000.0 Active 14/05/2010 - U51101WB2010PTC148664 EVERGROW COMMOTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 683720.0 Active 19/05/2010 - U51101WB2010PTC148666 MOUNTVIEW IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED 347400.0 Active 05/03/2014 - U51909WB2009PTC135108 PROFUSION MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 938500.0 Active 15/05/2009 - U51909WB2009PTC135117 SUNVALLEY VANIJYA PRIVATE LIMITED 959700.0 Active 15/05/2009 - U64203WB2000PTC090968 ANKIT NETWARE PRIVATE LIMITED 1046900.0 Active 20/01/2000 - -
Associated with Directors
RAJKUMAR BIDASARIA Director TAPAN KUMAR DAS Director PRADIP KUMAR DATTA Director