PALLAB SENGUPTA
-
About PALLAB SENGUPTA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U26941WB1991PTC052843 NAVSAKTI BIO-TECH PRIVATE LIMITED 3500000.0 Active 30/12/2003 - U27100MH1982PLC026186 MURBAD STEELS LTD 1799400.0 Active 01/09/2006 - U51109WB2007PTC116165 KAY PEE VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 5100000.0 Active 04/08/2014 - U51909WB2011PLC164441 GOODEARTH IMPEX LIMITED 500000.0 Active 04/08/2014 - U52100WB2010PTC141758 JIWAN JYOTI COMMERCIAL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/08/2014 - U63032WB2007PTC116409 AQUA TRANSLINERS PRIVATE LIMITED 17000000.0 Active 30/03/2017 - U65990WB2009PLC139632 VSR FINVEST LIMITED 500000.0 Active 04/08/2014 - U67120WB1992PTC056125 NAVKAR HOLDINGS PVT. LTD. 3202000.0 Active 30/12/2004 - U70101WB2007PTC120284 XTRA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/08/2014 - U74140WB1987PTC043225 Y A CONSULTANCY SERVICES PVT LTD 6500000.0 Active 04/08/1993 - U74140WB1991PTC053624 DS FINANCE & CONSULTANCY PVT LTD 2702000.0 Active 30/12/2004 - -
Associated with Directors