PRADEEP AGARWAL
-
About PRADEEP AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01132WB1989PTC047892 VANGUARD HOLDINGS PVT LTD 17600200.0 Active 27/08/2007 - U45207WB2000PLC091590 B.G.M. CONSORTIUM LIMITED 37249000.0 Active 02/01/2008 17/11/2015 U70109WB1995PTC071596 AASHRAY PROMOTERS PVT.LTD. 7602000.0 Active 12/09/2007 - -
Associated with Directors
ANIL BHUTORIA Director JAI PRAKASH BANGANI Director SANDIP BHUTORIA Director BIPLAB SARKAR Director