PRAKASH DAVARA
-
About PRAKASH DAVARA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U02692CT1996PTC011362 PRAGATI CERAMICS PRIVATE LIMITED 102000.0 Active 01/12/1996 - U15543CT1999PTC013296 SAMRIDHI BEVERAGES PRIVATE LIMITED 103000.0 Active 02/02/1999 - U45201CT1988PTC004684 CHINMOY BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 203800.0 Active 01/07/1988 - U70102CT2008PTC020922 C. P. TOWNSHIP AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/11/2008 - -
Associated with Directors
PREETI DAVARA Director CHINMOY DAVARA Director NARENDRA DAVARA Director