PARKASH TOTA RAM
-
About PARKASH TOTA RAM,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200CH2005PTC028533 SAGE ENCLAVE AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/10/2010 - U45200PB2007PTC031184 VITAL BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 01/06/2007 - U45201DL1998PTC096541 VINSAR CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 104600.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U45201DL2001PTC111772 ATULYA ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U45400DL2007PTC162130 GREENLINE APARTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U45400DL2007PTC162132 V & V APARTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/03/2013 - U45400DL2007PTC162137 GREEN GEM PROMOTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U70100DL2007PTC162146 GREEN AREA ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U70101DL2004PTC129042 TIARA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 295340.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U70101DL2004PTC129438 CLASSIC HEIGHTS DEVELOPMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U70102DL1996PTC077991 ANUPAM ESTATE & TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U70102DL2007PTC162138 GREEN GEM PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U70102DL2007PTC162140 LUDHIANA BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/03/2013 - U70200DL2007PTC162142 GULMOHAR REALCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U74999DL2007PTC162143 SV BUILDMART PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/03/2013 - U74999HR2012PTC046501 DAILY FACILITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
VIJAY SINGH Director BISHAMBER DAYAL Director