PABAN GOPAL UPLA
-
About PABAN GOPAL UPLA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U28123PN2006PTC129355 SAMARTHYA ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED 7250000.0 Active 26/12/2006 - U28123PN2007PTC129434 VIRTUE ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED 1500000.0 Active 01/03/2008 - U28123PN2007PTC129435 PERCH ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED 1725100.0 Active 08/01/2007 - U29253PN2012PTC144524 EVERDEW ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED 450000.0 Active 28/08/2012 - U29299PN2007PTC129430 GODSENT ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED 1500000.0 Active 05/01/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
SHRABANI PABAN UPLA Director RAJENDRA LALASHEB SHINDE Director VITHAL DAGADU SHINDE Director