PRATHMESH MAIRAL
-
About PRATHMESH MAIRAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40100MH2016PTC287614 MH PARBHANI POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 405950000.0 Active 01/09/2017 - U40106GJ2014PTC079088 SOLARGISE GRAPP ENERGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 144350000.0 Active 01/05/2014 31/08/2017 U40106MH2016PTC285439 UP KORAUN URJA PRIVATE LIMITED 344000000.0 Active 01/09/2017 - U40108CT2013PTC001201 GRAPP ENERGY VENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 24/12/2013 31/08/2017 U40108MH2012PTC229700 ESSEL URJA PRIVATE LIMITED 25838100.0 Active 01/09/2017 - U40300MH2016PLC280293 GCSL SOLAR SOLUTIONS LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/09/2017 - U40300MH2016PTC285333 UP MEHRAUNI - II URJA PRIVATE LIMITED 297950000.0 Active 01/09/2017 - U40300MH2016PTC285342 UP SARILA URJA PRIVATE LIMITED 374850000.0 Active 01/09/2017 - U40300MH2016PTC285529 UP MEHRAUNI - I URJA PRIVATE LIMITED 330000000.0 Active 01/09/2017 - U40300MH2016PTC286024 DAKSHIN ODISHA URJA PRIVATE LIMITED 410100000.0 Active 01/09/2017 - U74140HR2014PTC054046 GRAPP RENEWABLES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/12/2014 31/08/2017 U74999CT2012PTC000267 GRAPP ENERGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 30/04/2013 31/08/2017 -
Associated with Directors